judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WARD VS. IMPERIAL PALACE C/W 37159

Case Information: 36316
Short Caption:WARD VS. IMPERIAL PALACE C/W 37159Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:36316*, 37159 Related Case(s): 37159
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A361453Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/26/2000 / Paustian, KathleenSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/20/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Christopherson Law Offices--check no. 1078.
06/20/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10522
06/26/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Rawlings Olson Cannon Gormley & Desruisseaux--check no. 053881.
06/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 00-10828
06/26/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Kathleen M. Paustian. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/06/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter.
08/08/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 00-13766
08/08/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statements mailed to counsel for appellant/cross-respondent and respondent/cross-appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
08/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. 00-14289
08/16/2000Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant/Cross-Respondent and Respondent/Cross-Appellant shall have 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a). Appellant/Cross-Respondent shall have 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-14289
08/23/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 00-14798
08/24/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Respondent/Cross-Appellant. 00-14856
08/24/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Determination of Failure to Participate in Good Faith and for Sanctions. STRICKEN BY ORDER 12/14/00. 00-14909
08/25/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 17, 2000. To Court Reporter: Carrie Hansen. 00-14956
08/30/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: May 17, 2000. To Court Reporter: Joy Hinck. 00-15248
08/31/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter Karen L. Snyder. She has not received the required deposit for transcripts. 00-15376
09/01/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Determination of Failure to Participate in Good Faith and for Sanctions, Motion to Strike and Countermotion for Sanctions. 00-15505
09/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Attorneys Bird and Christopherson shall have 10 days from the date of this order to pay court recorder Snyder the required deposit and file proof of payment with this court. Failure to pay the deposit in a timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. Court recorder Snyder shall have 30 days from the receipt of the deposit within which to file and serve the requested transcript. 00-16553
09/27/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Compliance with Order Filed September 19, 2000. Deposit for transcripts has been paid. 00-17077
09/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from cross-appellant: 30 days from the date of this order. The preparation of transcripts and the briefing schedule are hereby suspended pending further order of this court. fn1[The court defers ruling on the motions and countermotion filed on August 24, 2000, and September 1, 2000, at this time.] 00-17113
09/28/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Karen L. Snyder, Court Reporter, indicating that the deposit for the transcripts have been received on 9/5/00. 00-17165
09/29/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 05/16/00 and 05/17/00. Court Reporter: Karen Snyder. 00-17244
10/30/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-19017
12/07/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 15, 2001. 00-21366
12/14/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On August 24, appellant/cross-respondent Shelly Ward filed motion for determination of bad faith participation in the settlement conference process and for sanctions. On September 1, 2000, Imperial Palace filed an opposition. The settlement judge filed a report on August 8, 2000, indicting that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. The settlement judge's report did not make a determination of a failure to participate in good faith. We deny Ward's motion. Imperial Palace moves this court to strike Ward's motion on the ground that it violates the confidentiality provision of NRAP 16(h). We grant Imperial Palace's motion. The clerk of this court shall forthwith strike Ward's motion filed on August 24, 2000. No good cause appearing, we deny Imperial Palace's counter-motion for sanctions against Ward. The time for requesting and preparing transcripts and the briefing schedule shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. 00-21872
04/26/2001MotionFiled Motion to Consolidate. Nos. 36316/37157. 01-07036
03/14/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Consolidating Appeals in Docket Nos. 36316 and 37159, Dismissing Cross-Appeal in Docket No. 36316, and Reinstating Briefing. Because Imperial Palace is not an aggrieved party, we dismiss its cross-appeal in Docket No. 36316. Our dismissal of Imperial Palace's cross-appeal does not preclude it from raising in its answering brief its contention that the district court erred in ruling upon Imperial Palace's motion to strike the complaint or, in the alternative, motion to dismiss. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption on this court's docket in Docket No. 36316 to reflect that there is no longer a cross-appellant or cross-respondent. We grant Imperial Palace's motion, which was filed in April 2001, to consolidate the appeals in Docket Nos. 36316 and 37159. We hereby reinstate the briefing schedules in these matters. These matters shall proceed on a parallel schedule. Appellant Ward shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief (and appendix) in Docket No. 36316. Similarly, appellant Imperial Palace shall have 70 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief (and appendix) in Docket No. 37159. Subsequent to the filing of each respective opening brief, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Nos. 36316/37159. 02-04660
05/09/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Nos. 36316/37159. 02-08172
05/14/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . these consolidated appeals are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK. Nos. 36316/37159. 02-08406
05/14/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.