Case Information: 55330 | |||
Short Caption: | BACON VS. SOIBERG (CHILD CUSTODY) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D386791 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/27/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/No Settlement. Notice of exemption from settlement conference program mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-02233 | |
01/27/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
01/29/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Throne & Hauser LLP - check no. 1003. | ||
01/29/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Documents from District Court Clerk. Family Court Cover Sheet. (CONFIDENTIAL). | 10-02591 | |
02/19/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 09/03/09. To Court Reporter: Shelly Ajoub. | 10-04547 | |
02/19/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-04625 | |
03/08/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/3/09. | 10-05997 | |
04/12/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Cetificate of Mailing. (Certification of Partial Transcripts and Partial Transcripts) | 10-09492 | |
05/05/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellant: Response due 30 days. Briefing is suspended. Respondent may file any reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. | 10-11587 | |
05/17/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (60) days. | 10-12732 | |
05/25/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying as Moot Motion for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | 10-13534 | |
06/03/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 5/25/10 addressed to Throne & Hauser. Corrected city and remailed. | 10-14250 | |
06/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. | 10-14518 | |
07/20/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP. | 10-18562 | |
08/16/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-19404 | |
08/16/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/23/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 18, 2010. | 10-19404 |