Case Information: 55329 | |||
Short Caption: | MORRISON (DONALD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C249834 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/27/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-02227 | |
01/27/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/27/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/22/09. Court Reporter: Dalyne Easley. Filed in district court on: December 30, 2009. | 10-02229 | |
03/10/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-06236 | |
03/10/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | ||
03/26/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-07939 | |
06/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Dispositional Order/Appeal. "VACATE MORRISON'S SENTENCE ENHANCEMENT AND REMAND this matter to the district court for entry of an amended judgment of conviction." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-14813 | |
06/28/2010 | Other | Returned Mail. Order 6/9/10 addressed to Lavell Roberson in error, the Order was forwarded back to our court by LLCC. Order has been remailed to Mr. Donald Morrison. | 10-16869 | |
07/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-15936 | |
07/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13. 2010. | 10-15936 |