judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: VCSP, LLC (NRAP 5)

Case Information: 55351
Short Caption:IN RE: VCSP, LLC (NRAP 5)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - NRAP 5 - U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/29/2010Order/IncomingFiled Order Certifying Question to Nevada Supreme Court. Received from U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nevada and the Honorable Linda B. Riegle, U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. 10-02598
01/29/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
02/10/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Submission of Filing Fee. The parties shall equally divide among themselves the $250 filing fee and each party shall pay its portion of the filing fee within ten days from the date of this order. 10-03697
02/19/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $50.00 from Gerrard & Cox firm - check no. 30468.
02/24/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $50.00 from Morris Polich & Purdy - check no. 8327.
02/25/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $50.00 from Shumway Van & Hansen. Check No. 2289.
03/03/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Accepting Certified Questions and Directing Briefing. Appellants: 45 days to file the opening brief and joint appendix. 10-05557
03/17/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $50.00 from Meier & Fine, LLC - check no. 006884. (Respondent FDIC)
04/01/2010MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave of Court to File Amicus Curiae Brief on Behalf of the Associated General Contractors, Las Vegas Chapter and Request for 45 Days to File. 10-08501
04/01/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Motion for Leave of Court to File Amicus Curiae Brief on Behalf of the Associated General Contractors, Las Vegas Chapter and Request for 45 Days to File. Due date: 10 days. 10-08502
04/08/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Service for Motion for Leave of Court to File Amicus Curiae Brief on Behalf of the Associated General Contractors, Las Vegas Chapter and Request for 45 Days to File. 10-09158
04/14/2010MotionFiled Motion. Amended Motion for Leave of Court to File Amicus Curiae Brief on Behalf of the Associated General Contractors, Las Vegas Chapter and Request for 45 Days to File. 10-09725
04/15/2010MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: May 17, 2010. 10-09890
04/23/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. Las Vegas Chapter of Associated General Contractors Amicus Brief due: 25 days. Nevada Chapter of Associated General Contractors Amicus Brief due: 25 days. Nevada Association of Mechanical Contractors Amicus Brief due: 25 days. 10-10565
04/26/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Additional Time to File Amicus Curiae Brief. (AGC Parties) 10-10717
05/20/2010BriefReceived Amicus Brief. (FILED PER ORDER 06/04/10). Amicus Brief on Behalf of the Associated General Contractors, Las Vegas Cahpter, Nevada Chapter of the Associated General Contractors and Nevada Association of Mechanical Contractors. 10-13233
05/20/2010BriefFiled Opening Brief. 10-13240
05/20/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. 10-13242
05/25/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing Amicus Curiae: Fontainebleau Mechanic's and Materialmen's Lienholders. 10-13532
05/25/2010MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave of Court to File Amicus Curiae Brief on Behalf of Fontainebleau Mechanics' and Materialmen's Lien Claimants and Subcontractors' Legislative Coalition, LLC. 10-13533
05/25/2010BriefReceived Amicus Brief. (FILED PER ORDER 06/04/10). Received via E-Flex. Fontainebleau Mechanics' and Materialmen's Lien Claimants and Subcontractors' Legislative Coalition, LLC.
05/27/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing Amicus Curiae Subcontractors Legislative Coalition, LLC and Certain Fountainebleau Mechanic's and Materialmen's Lienholders. Ricahrd L. Peel, Michael W. Brimley, Eric B. Zimbelman/Peel Brimley. 10-13793
06/04/2010MotionFiled Stipulation. Joint Motion to Withdraw Order Accepting Certified Questions and Directing Briefing. 10-14371
06/04/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Amici Curiae Brief, Granting Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief, and Regarding Filing Fee. The clerk of this court shall file the amici curiae brief received on May 20, 2010. The clerk of this court shall file the Fountainbleu Lienholders' and Subcontractors' Legislative Coalition's amici brief received on May 25, 2010. VCSP's portion of the filling fee due: 10 days. 10-14466
06/04/2010BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Amicus Brief on Behalf of the Associated General Contractors, Las Vegas Cahpter, Nevada Chapter of the Associated General Contractors and Nevada Association of Mechanical Contractors. 10-13233
06/04/2010BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Amicus Curiae Brief on Behalf of Fontainebleau Mechanics' and Materialmen's Lien Claimants and Subcontractors' Legislative Coalition, LLC 10-14469
06/10/2010MotionFiled Motion. Supplement to Joint Motion to Withdraw Order Accepting Certified Questions and Directing Briefing. 10-14982
06/10/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Supplement to Joint Motion to Withdraw Order Accepting Certified Questions and Directing Briefing. Due date: 10 days. 10-14983
06/16/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Supplement to Joint Motion to Withdraw Order Accepting Certified Questions and Directing Briefing 10-15594
06/21/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Voluntary Dismissal. Order Approving Stipulation to Withdraw Certified Questions and Dismissing NRAP 5 Proceeding. VCSP shall have five days from the date of this order to pay its portion of the filing fee. "We dismiss this proceeding." 10-16093
06/21/2010Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.
06/25/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $50.00 from Kaempfer Crowell Renshaw Gronauer & Fiorentino - check no. 76101.