Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/27/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 10-02236 |
01/27/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | | |
01/28/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt | | 10-02482 |
01/29/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Alverson, Taylor, Mortensen & Sanders - check no. 86465. | | |
02/16/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 10-04086 |
03/01/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. | | 10-05255 |
03/05/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/8/10 | | 10-05885 |
05/12/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter (w/respondent Wells Cargo.) The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter with respondent Howard Hughes Corporation only. | | 10-12377 |
05/27/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. Appellant and Respondent Howard Hughes Corp. have settled. Appellant: 30 days to file stip to dismiss as to Howard Hughes corp. The remaining parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | | 10-13795 |
06/15/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 3/3/09, 4/9/09, 4/14/09, 10/1/09, 12/22/09, 5/23/10, 6/9/10. To Court Reporter: Norma Ramirez. | | 10-15550 |
06/28/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Appellant United Rentals' Motion to Dismiss Respondent Howard Hughes Corporation | | 10-16870 |
07/14/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent Wells Cargo, Inc.'s Response to Appellant United Rentals' Motion to Dismiss Respondent the Howard Hughes Corporation. | | 10-18080 |
07/22/2010 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Appellant United Rentals' Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Respondent the Howard Hughes Corporation. | | 10-18965 |
08/03/2010 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Parraguirre. | | |
08/19/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Certificate of Mailing Transcripts, Pursuant to NRAP 9(a)(4). | | 10-21355 |
08/25/2010 | Motion | Filed Appellant United Rentals Highway Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for a Ninety Day Extension to File Its Opening Brief. | | 10-21781 |
08/26/2010 | Motion | Filed Supplement for Appellant United Rentals Highway Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for a Ninety Day Extension to File Its Opening Brief. | | 10-22041 |
09/02/2010 | Motion | Filed Respondent Wells Cargo, Inc.'s Response to Appellant United Rentals Highway Technologies, Inc.'s Motion for a Ninety Day Extension to File its Opening Brief. | | 10-22560 |
09/10/2010 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response Appellant United Rentals Highway Technologies, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for a Ninety Day Extension to File its Opening Brief Pursuant to NRAP 31 (a)(1). | | 10-23314 |
09/13/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals, Granting Motion for Extension of Time, and Granting Motion to Dismiss Respondent The Howard Hughes Corporation. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. We dismiss The Howard Hughes Corporation from this appeal. Nos. 55331/56701. | | 10-23444 |
09/23/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. Due date: 10 days. | | 10-24527 |
10/05/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Nos. 55331/56701. | | 10-25710 |
10/11/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Norma Ramirez stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 5/25/10. Nos. 55331/56701. | | 10-26609 |
11/18/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant: 15 days to file a response. Deadline for Requesting Transcripts in docket No. 56923 suspended and the briefing schedules in these three appeals shall be suspended. Repondent may file a reply within 10 days from the date that appellant's response is served. Fn2 [We waive the NRAP 9 requirement in case no. 56701.] Nos. 55331/56701/56923 (no. 56923 is not consolidated with 55311/56701). | | 10-30136 |
12/06/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 55331/56701. | | 10-31567 |
01/14/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Consolidating Appeals and Reinstating Briefing. We consolidate Docket No. 56923 with Docket Nos. 55331 and 56701, and we reinstate the deadlines for requesting transcripts and briefing. Appellant: 15 days to file transcript request in docket no. 56923. Opening brief and appendix due 90 days. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-01525 |
02/01/2011 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request . Certificate that No Transcript is Being Requested. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-03124 |
04/15/2011 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-11281 |
04/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 1. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-11282 |
04/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 3. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-11287 |
04/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 4. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-11288 |
04/15/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief - Volume 2. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-11359 |
05/11/2011 | Motion | Filed Stipulation for Extension of Time for Respondent Wells Cargo, Inc. to File its Answering Brief. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-14097 |
05/11/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice - Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due: June 15, 2011. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-14099 |
06/13/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion by Respondent for Extension of Time for Filing Answering Brief (Second Request). Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-17551 |
06/17/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. Nos. 55331/56701/56923 | | 11-18070 |
07/14/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion by Respondent for Extension of Time for Filing Answering Brief (Third Request). Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-21273 |
07/15/2011 | Motion | Filed Opposition to Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Answering Brief (Third Request). Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-21448 |
07/26/2011 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Reply in Support of Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Answering Brief (Third Request). | | 11-22391 |
07/29/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting in Part Motion for Extension of Time to File Answering Brief. Respondent: Answering Brief due: 15 days. Nos. 55331/56701/56923 | | 11-22845 |
08/16/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-24849 |
08/16/2011 | Appendix | Filed Respondent's Appendix. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-24850 |
09/09/2011 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Respondent's Answering Brief (First Request). Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-27532 |
09/09/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion Approved. Reply Brief due by October 14, 2011. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-27537 |
10/14/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 11-31835 |
10/14/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | | |
04/30/2012 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Clerk to Schedue Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before the Northern Nevada Panel on the next available calendar. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 12-13559 |
06/11/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for Tuesday, July 17, 2012, at 10:30 a.m. in Carson City. Argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | | 12-18267 |
07/05/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 12-21013 |
07/13/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Nathan R. Reinmiller of Alverson, Taylor, Moretenson and Sanders appearing on behalf of appellant United Rentals Highway Technologies). Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 12-22070 |
07/13/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Steven T. Jaffe of Hall Jaffe & Clayton appearing on behalf of respondent Wells Cargo Inc). | | 12-22225 |
07/13/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Steven T. Jaffe of Hall Jaffe & Clayton appearing on behalf of respondent Wells Cargo Inc). | | 12-22226 |
07/13/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance (Steven T. Jaffe of Hall Jaffe & Clayton appearing on behalf of respondent Wells Cargo Inc). | | 12-22227 |
07/17/2012 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP12-NS/KP/JH. | | |
12/06/2012 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Reversed." Before Saitta, Pickering and Hardesty, JJ. Author: Hardesty, J. 128 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 59. NNP12 Nos. 55331/56701/56923 | | 12-38417 |
12/20/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Appellant United Rentals Highway Technologies, Inc.'s Bill of Costs. | | 12-40380 |
12/26/2012 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Respondent's Petition for Rehearing (Respondent Wells Cargo, Inc.). Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 12-40724 |
12/26/2012 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Filing Fee on Rehearing. Due date: 10 days. Nos. 55331/56701/56923. | | 12-40739 |
12/28/2012 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Respondent Wells Cargo, Inc.'s Objection to Appellant United Rentals Highway Technologies, Inc.'s Bill of Costs. | | 12-41180 |
12/31/2012 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Hall Jaffe & Clayton check no. 17941. | | |
02/05/2013 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Nos. 55331/56701/56923 | | 13-03759 |
03/06/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Re: Costs. Costs are to be taxed against respondent in the amount of $130.20. Nos. 55331/56701/56923 | | 13-06821 |
03/06/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Memorandum of Costs. Costs allowed and taxed: $130.20. Nos. 55331/56701/56923 | | 13-06826 |
03/06/2013 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Memorandum of Costs and Disbursements allowed and taxed in the amount of $130.20. Nos. 55331/56701/56923 | | 13-06828 |
03/06/2013 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. Nos. 55331/56701/56923 | | |
03/18/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 12, 2013. | | 13-06828 |
03/27/2013 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter to Publishers re: Corrections to recently filed opinions. Nos. 56510, 55331/56701/56923, 57875, 59559, 57656, 57469, 58041 58048. (Letter entered in 56510 as document no. 13-09012.) | | |