Case Information: 49635 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: DISCIPLINE OF STEVEN SORENSON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | NONE | Classification: | Bar Matter - Discipline - Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/31/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/15/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/15/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. 1 through 7. | 07-13163 | |
06/15/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. | 07-13165 | |
07/31/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/01/2007 | Order/Dispositional Bar | Filed Bar Discipline Order. Order Declining To Impose Suspension (No. 49635) And Order Disbarring Attorney Steven Sorenson (No. 50047). ". . . the panel's recommendation of disbarment is approved in full, and Sorenson is disbarred from the practice of law in this state." fn4-[We decline to impose the panel's recommendation for a 6-month plus 1-day suspension (Docket No. 49635). The recommended suspension is moot in light of this order of disbarment.] fn5-[This is our final disposition of this matter. Any new proceedings concerning Sorenson shall be docketed under a new docket number.] EN BANC-WM/MG/JH/RP/MD/MC/NS Nos. 49635 and 50047 (not consolidated) | 07-24008 | |
11/28/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 through 7 returned this day. | 07-25157 | |
11/28/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/06/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 3, 2007. | 07-25157 |