Case Information: 49636 | |||
Short Caption: | LICATA VS. ZIARKO | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A452646 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 07/03/2007 / Reed, Nathaniel | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/18/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Mandelbaum & Schwarz - check no. 4100. | ||
06/18/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-13194 | |
06/28/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | 07-14100 | |
07/03/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nathaniel J. Reed. | 07-14546 | |
07/10/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 07-15048 | |
07/13/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-15215 | |
07/13/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Docketing Statement. | 07-15216 | |
07/19/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. | 07-15746 | |
08/13/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-17799 | |
09/05/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 07-19479 | |
09/13/2007 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 07-20243 | |
10/01/2007 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. | 07-21576 | |
10/03/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 12/18/06. To Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. | 07-21832 | |
11/21/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Transcripts. We elect to apply the amended version of NRAP 9(b) to the transcript listed in Ms. Hamilton's notice. Appellant shall include a copy of the December 18, 2006, transcript in the appendix to the opening brief, and Ms. Hamilton is not obligated to file a copy of the transcript in this court. Fn1 [A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] | 07-25471 | |
12/06/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Withdraw as Appellant's Counsel and Request for Extension of Time to File Opening Brief. | 07-26395 | |
12/21/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. to Withdraw and to Extend Time to File Opening Brief. The clerk shall remove Kim Irene Mandelbaum and the law firm of Mandelbaum & Schwarz as counsel for appellant. Appellant: 30 days to obtain counsel or inform this court in writing that he will be proceeding in proper person. Opening Brief due: 3/11/08. | 07-27749 | |
02/25/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Peter J. Licata stating that he is unable to find an attorney to represent him. FILED PER ORDER OF 3/4/08. | 08-04549 | |
03/04/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The clerk shall file the proper person letter received on February 25, 2008. Appellant: 20 days from the date of this order to file a notice that he understands that he does not need an attorney to pursue an appeal and either (1) wishes for this appeal to proceed in proper person, or (2) still wishes to dismiss this appeal. We caution appellant that failure to timely comply with this order may result in this appeal being dismissed as abandoned. | 08-05405 | |
03/04/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Peter J. Licata stating that he is unable to find an attorney to represent him. | 08-04549 | |
04/24/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellant has failed to respond to our March 4, 2008, order, or otherwise communicate with this court. "This appeal is dismissed as abandoned." NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-10217 | |
05/20/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-10504 | |
05/20/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/28/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 22, 2008. | 08-10504 |