Case Information: 49637 | |||
Short Caption: | COX VS. MCDANIEL | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0608012 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/20/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/19/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/19/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-13195 | |
06/28/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 07-14138 | |
06/28/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Informa Pauperis Waiver of Transcript Fees. | 07-14139 | |
07/02/2007 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-14454 | |
07/06/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to "Amend" Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 07-14748 | |
08/02/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. Respondent's response due: 45 days. Fn3[We defer ruling on appellant's request for transcripts, motion to waive transcript fees, and motion to amend trancript request form.] | 07-17025 | |
08/20/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-18365 | |
08/20/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/17/2007 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-20515 | |
09/17/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Respondent's Appendix. | 07-20516 | |
10/02/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Adequate Legal Supplies. | 07-21695 | |
10/22/2007 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Request for Submission. | 07-23208 | |
11/20/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "The order dismissing Cox's complaint with prejudice is reversed, and the matter is remanded to the district court for further proceedings." Fn10 [. . . Cox's request for transcripts, and his June 28, 2007 motion for waiver of transcript fees and July 6, 2007 motion to amend his transcript request form, are denied. As Cox has complied with the requirements of this court's pilot program for proper person civil litigants, and because Cox's requests for relief related to other matters are outside of the scope of this appeal, his October 2, 2007 motion for adequate legal supplies is denied. Cox's October 22, 2007 request for submission of that motion is denied as moot. SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 07-25289 | |
12/18/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-26958 | |
12/18/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/26/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 21, 2007. | 07-26958 |