Case Information: 49645 | |||
Short Caption: | JACKSON VS. NEVADA STATE WELFARE DIV. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 52729 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - FV0402990 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/10/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/18/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. WAIVED PER ORDER OF JUNE 23, 2007. | ||
06/18/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-13215 | |
06/18/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 07-13216 | |
06/29/2007 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on June 23, 2007 granting appellant leave to proceed in forma pauperis. | 07-14274 | |
07/09/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 07-14872 | |
07/09/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Enlargement of Time. | 07-14873 | |
07/13/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Enlargement of Time. | 07-15241 | |
08/08/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Order Denying as Moot Motion Regarding Transcript Request Form and Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Civil Appeal Statement. Civil Appeal Statement due: August 30, 2007. | 07-17384 | |
08/24/2007 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-18809 | |
08/24/2007 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Supplemental Motion to Appeal of District Court Judge's Order. | 07-18810 | |
09/11/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due in District Court Case no. FV0402990. 30 days. | 07-20045 | |
10/10/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-22378 | |
10/10/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Response. Due: 45 days. Not to exceed 10 pages. | 08-02340 | |
03/13/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. (Respondent's) Points and Authorities in Response to Appeal of District Court Order. (EXHIBITS A AND B STRICKEN PER ORDER 05/14/08). | 08-06302 | |
04/09/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Enlargement of Time to File a Reply to Response to Appeal of District Court Order. | 08-08866 | |
04/09/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Strike the Introduction of Evidence not Presented to the District Court. | 08-08867 | |
04/17/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Reply to Response to Appeal of District Court Judge's Order. | 08-09595 | |
05/14/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "We reverse and remand the district court's order for a proper determination on the issue of paternity. We also stay the temporary support recommendations of the court master, pending the district court's ruling on paternity." fn3[We grant appellant's motion and order exhibits A and B of respondent's response stricken.] SNP08-JH/RP/MD [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-12167 | |
06/10/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-13084 | |
06/10/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/23/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 11, 2008. | 08-13084 | |
09/15/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion for Reimbursement of Bill Costs. | 08-23778 | |
09/26/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Permission of Bill Costs. | 08-24968 | |
10/10/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. for Reimbursement of Costs of Appeal. | 08-26146 |