judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ALLAN EBERT

Case Information: 10-BG-1164
Short Caption:IN RE: ALLAN EBERTClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Miscellaneous
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:09/17/2010

Opening Event Date:09/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselNPro SeN
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentAllen Ebert NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/17/2010FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/17/2010PETITION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Bar Counsel)
09/17/2010RECEIVED second address for respondent. 12413 Barbara Road Silver Spring, MD 20906
10/06/2010ORDER On consideration of Bar Counsel's motion for an order to show cause why respondent should not be held in criminal contempt, it is ORDERED that Bar Counsel's motion for an order to show cause why respondent should not be held in criminal contempt is granted, and the Clerk is directed to transmit the pleadings herein to the Honorable John M. Campbell, Judge of the Superior Court of the District of Columbia, designated in accordance with D.C. Code Sec 11-707 (a) to serve as a judge of this Court for a hearing to be conducted with respect to the issue whether respondent should be found in criminal contempt. (FI,TH,NW)
03/01/2011ORDER It appearing to the court that a status hearing is necessary in this case, it is this 1st day of March, 2011, hereby ORDERED tha the parties shall appear for a status hearing on 1st day of April 2011, at 10:00 am in courtroom A-47, located at 515 5th street, NW, Washington, D.C. (Judge John M. Campbell)
03/10/2011RECEIVED returned order sent to respondent at 2607 24th Street, NW, Suite 2, Washington, D.C. 20008, order dated March 1, 2011 from Judge Campbell.
03/18/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL
04/28/2011DISMISSED ORDERED that the motion to dismiss is granted; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the order to show cause is dismissed without prejudice. Judge John M. Campbell