Case Information: 49641 | |||
Short Caption: | MCINTYRE VS. MCINTYRE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - DV9501493 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/12/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/19/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Diana McIntryre-check no. 3019. | ||
06/19/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-13203 | |
07/02/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 07-14469 | |
07/27/2007 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Court Reporter Marjorie G. Davall requesting a 30 day extension for preparation and filing of transcript. | 07-16571 | |
07/30/2007 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-16682 | |
09/05/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due in District Court Case no, DV9501493 due 30 days. Court Reporter Davall: Transcripts due 30 days. | 07-19513 | |
10/05/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 04/20/07. Court Reporter: Marjorie Davall. | 07-21986 | |
10/10/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 5. | 07-22326 | |
10/10/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Response. Due: 45 days. Not to exceed 10 pages. | 08-02343 | |
03/12/2008 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-06119 | |
03/12/2008 | Case Status Update | Resubmitted for Decision. | ||
08/18/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-21320 | |
09/12/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-21524 | |
09/12/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/22/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 15, 2008. | 08-21524 |