Case Information: 49634 | |||
Short Caption: | SMITH (LARRY) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 61659 , 73719 , 73719-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR063061 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/23/2008 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/15/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/15/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 07-13116 | |
07/02/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-14448 | |
07/02/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/09/07 and 04/10/07. To Court Reporter: Cecelia Vohl. | 07-14449 | |
07/13/2007 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on July 11, 2007. | 07-15243 | |
07/31/2007 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Cecelia Vohl stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. | 07-16828 | |
10/15/2007 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: November 14, 2007. | 07-22770 | |
11/02/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-24051 | |
11/02/2007 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 through 3. | 07-24052 | |
11/02/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Order Directing the Clerk of the Second Judicial District Court to Deliver a Trial Exhibit (Exhibit No. 2) to this Court as Part of the Appellate Record in this case. | 07-24053 | |
11/16/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Exhibit and Re: Transcripts. The clerk of the district court shall, within 20 days from the date of this order , certify and transmit to this court the original DVD, admitted into evidence as Exhibit No. 2. Ms. Vohl is not obligated to file copies of the transcripts in this court. fn1[A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] | 07-25070 | |
11/30/2007 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibits (copies). Exhibit 2: DVD. | 07-25856 | |
12/04/2007 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 07-26119 | |
12/21/2007 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 07-27781 | |
01/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 08-01788 | |
01/23/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/10/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-08890 | |
04/21/2008 | Other | Returned Mail. Receipt for Docs 4/11/08-Larry Eugene Smith. Updated address per NDOC and remailed. | 08-09823 | |
05/06/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits:Exhibit 2: DVD this day. | 08-09413 | |
05/06/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/16/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 13, 2008. | 08-09413 | |
06/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion. The proper person motion received in this court on April 11, 2008, is hereby denied as moot. | 08-16014 |