Case Information: 55356 | |||
Short Caption: | RIGGS VS. ISAACS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 55746 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A533729 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/02/2010 / Haberfeld, Stephen | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/01/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-02665 | |
02/01/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
02/02/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld | 10-02857 | |
02/03/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Schuetze & McGaha - check no. 14172. | ||
02/18/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-04471 | |
02/18/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. | 10-04472 | |
02/25/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Docketing Statement Served on Settlement Judge. | 10-05087 | |
03/03/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/2/10 | 10-05639 | |
05/25/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. Respondent. | 10-13595 | |
05/25/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement (Respondent) | 10-13596 | |
06/02/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Docketing Statement Served on Settlement Judge. | 10-14210 | |
06/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. | 10-14590 | |
06/07/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice. | 10-14592 | |
06/08/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. 55356 and 55746. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 10-14655 | |
06/15/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice served on Settlement Judge. | 10-15578 | |
06/16/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH | 10-15680 | |
06/16/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |