Case Information: 55355 | |||
Short Caption: | JMA ARCHITECTS, INC. VS. VESTIN REALTY MORTGAGE I, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A555070 Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A555803 Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A557205 Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A559008 Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A561999 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Parraguirre, Pickering | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Douglas for Chief Justice Pickering | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | 02/04/2010 / Hoppe, Craig | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/01/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-02659 | |
02/01/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/01/2010 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Parraguirre. (Kemp Jones & Coulthard, LLP) | ||
02/01/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 10-02660 | |
02/01/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 10-02661 | |
02/04/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Craig A. Hoppe | 10-03094 | |
02/08/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Marquis & Aurbach - check no. 097649. | ||
02/17/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-04179 | |
02/19/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 10-04551 | |
03/02/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | 10-05401 | |
03/17/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Associate Counsel. (Elizabeth Glazer Chilton, Esq. and Sophia Shunwan Lau, Esq.). | 10-07136 | |
03/17/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Motion to Associate Counsel. | 10-07139 | |
03/26/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. -Motion to Associate Counsel. | 10-07983 | |
04/26/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-10733 | |
05/07/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Joint Motion for Temporary Remand for the Limited Purpose of Allowing the District Court to Enter an Order Amending Order on Appeal Pursuant to Huneycutt v. Huneycutt. | 10-11971 | |
07/14/2010 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Pickering. Voluntary recusal. | ||
07/19/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Respondents' Motion to Associate California Attorneys Chilton and Lau. Attorney Andrew Baum shall be responsible for all matters presented by Chilton and Lau in this matter. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: Transcript 15 days; Opening Brief 90 days; Case Appeal Statement 10 days. We approve the parties' joint motion to remand this matter to the district court for the limited purpose of amending the order and final judgment. fn1[The parties note that the order "contains some clerical errors that may confuse the issues on appeal."] Appellant: Status Report on Remand Procedures - 30 days. | 10-18460 | |
07/22/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 10-18928 | |
08/03/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 11/10/09. To Court Reporter: Peggy Isom. | 10-19983 | |
08/05/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. John O. Meara of the Law Firm of Bremer, Whyte, Brown & O'Meara as attorney for respondents in the place and stead of the Law Firm of Glaser, Weil, Fink, Jacobs, Howard & Shapiro, LLP. | 10-20200 | |
08/20/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Status Report. Appellant's Status Report in Compliance with this Court's July 19, 2010 Order. | 10-21450 | |
08/26/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Associate Counsel. Representing Respondent Vestin Realty Mortgage, Devin Alexander McRae, Esq. | 10-22057 | |
08/26/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Associate Counsel. Representing Respondent Vestin Realty Mortgage, Amy Elizabeth Duncan, Esq. | 10-22058 | |
08/27/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy Isom stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/10/09. | 10-22173 | |
10/06/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motions to Associate Counsel. California attorneys Devin Alexander McRae and Amy Elizabeth Duncan of the law firm Early Sullivan Wright Gizer & McRae, LLP shall be permitted to appear on behalf of the Vestin respondents in this appeal. Nevada attorney John O'Meara, of the law firm Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara, LLP, shall be responsible for all matters presented by Mr. McRae and Ms. Duncan in this matter. | 10-26071 | |
10/18/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation for an Enlargement of Time for Parties to File Briefs. | 10-27083 | |
11/18/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: November 30, 2010. Answering Brief due: January 21, 2011. | 10-30167 | |
11/29/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 1. | 10-30924 | |
11/29/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 2. | 10-30925 | |
11/29/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 3. | 10-30926 | |
11/29/2010 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix - Volume 4. | 10-30927 | |
11/30/2010 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | 10-31090 | |
01/21/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief (Regarding The Durango Property). | 11-02076 | |
01/21/2011 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondents' Answering Brief. (Vestin Respondents With Respect to Warm Springs aka Fort Apache and La Piazza Properties Only). | 11-02128 | |
02/15/2011 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Appellant's reply brief due: March 1, 2011. | 11-04894 | |
03/02/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | 11-06324 | |
03/02/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. | ||
03/08/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion. Notice of Supplemental Authority and Request for Immediate Disposition of Appeal Because the Supplemental Authority has Squarely Decided the Issues in this Appeal. | 11-07047 | |
04/07/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. Having reviewed the parties' briefs, respondents' supplemental authority, and the appendix, we affirm the jdugment of the district court. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-10384 | |
05/02/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-12826 | |
05/02/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/17/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 11, 2011. | 11-12826 |