judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SAINTAL (PRISCELLA) VS. STATE C/W 55322/55323

Case Information: 55324
Short Caption:SAINTAL (PRISCELLA) VS. STATE C/W 55322/55323Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 55322 *, 55323 , 55324
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C117656 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/25/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 10-02032
01/25/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/11/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." SNP10-JH/MD/RP. Nos. 55322/55323/55324. 10-06394
04/07/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-07089
04/07/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 9, 2010. 10-07089