Case Information: 55325 | |||
Short Caption: | VALENCIA, JR. (JOSE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 47137 , 55317 , 62060 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 31368 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/26/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/26/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-02168 | |
03/11/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." Fn1[We have considered the documents submitted in this matter, and we conclude that no relief is warranted for the reason set forth above.] SNP10-JH/MD/KP. | 10-06398 | |
05/10/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 10-12008 | |
06/04/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-13141 | |
06/04/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on June 7, 2010. | 10-13141 | |
08/30/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on June 14, 2010 and placed on the docket August 25, 2010 as Case No. 10-6068. | 10-22247 | |
11/05/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. | 10-29092 |