Case Information: 49648 | |||
Short Caption: | WILLIAMS (RONALD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45904 , 45991 , 50144 , 51519 , 55368 , 55567 , 59093 , 59389 , 72099 , 73712 , 73712-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C197042 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/09/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/18/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/18/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-13231 | |
06/25/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. | 07-13781 | |
06/28/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 07-14112 | |
07/18/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on July 13, 2007. | 07-15632 | |
07/31/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 07-16764 | |
08/09/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. (TRANSFERRED TO 51519 PER ORDER FILED 05/15/08 IN 51519.) | 07-17639 | |
08/09/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/11/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Due: 40 days. | 07-19988 | |
11/02/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 4. (TRANSFERRED TO 51519 PER ORDER FILED 05/15/08 IN 51519.) | 07-24098 | |
02/15/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Supplemental Record due: 40 days (transcript of 4/20/04). | 08-03900 | |
02/26/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Peggy Isom stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 4/20/04. | 08-04637 | |
02/28/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 5 (contains transcript of 04/20/04). (TRANSFERRED TO 51519 PER ORDER FILED 05/15/08 IN 51519.) | 08-05053 | |
04/01/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. State: 30 days to show cause. | 08-08032 | |
05/02/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 08-11009 | |
06/13/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Affirming in Part, Reversing in Part and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn36-[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter. We conclude that appellant is only entitled to the relief described herein. This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-15093 | |
07/08/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-15494 | |
07/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/17/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 11, 2008. | 08-15494 |