Case Information: 55347 | |||
Short Caption: | ESTATE OF WILLARD FERHAT VS. TLC HOLDINGS, LLC | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A562984 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/02/2010 / Smith, Jay | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 04/11/2011 at 11:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Regional Justice Center |
Submission Date: | 04/11/2011 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/28/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-02508 | |
01/28/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
02/01/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Victor Lee Miller check no. 15703. | ||
02/02/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jay Earl Smith | 10-02855 | |
03/02/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 10-05512 | |
03/03/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a conference is scheduled for 4/29/10 | 10-05590 | |
03/15/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-06842 | |
03/25/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Appellant counsels' signed verification page to Docketing Statement. | 10-07818 | |
05/04/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-11397 | |
05/05/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 10-11583 | |
05/17/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-12802 | |
08/05/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Opening Brief due: September 3, 2010; Answering Brief due: October 4, 2010. | 10-20278 | |
09/07/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-22799 | |
09/07/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. | 10-22800 | |
10/04/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-25713 | |
10/04/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent's Appendix. | 10-25716 | |
11/10/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-29532 | |
02/18/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Clerk to Schedule Oral Argument. The clerk of this court is directed to schedule this matter for oral argument before a panel of this court on the next available calendar. The argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. | 11-05371 | |
03/04/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for April 11, 2011 at 11:30 a.m. at the Regional Justice Center for 30 minutes before the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP | 11-06653 | |
03/28/2011 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 11-09292 | |
04/06/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Appearance. Brent Vogel submits this Notice of Appearance on behalf of respondent for oral argument on April 11, 2011. | 11-10298 | |
04/11/2011 | Case Status Update | Oral argument held this day. Case submitted for decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP11-MC/MG/KP | ||
07/28/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. "ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." | 11-22742 | |
08/22/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-25462 | |
08/22/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
08/31/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 29, 2011. | 11-25462 |