Case Information: 55344 | |||
Short Caption: | RAGLAND (CLARENCE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 58379 , 60165 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C256886 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/16/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/28/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-02500 | |
01/28/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/05/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-03330 | |
02/16/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-04084 | |
05/14/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-12537 | |
05/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 10-12559 | |
05/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume II. | 10-12570 | |
05/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Volume III. | 10-12571 | |
06/14/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. | 10-15374 | |
06/14/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Answering Brief due date: July 14, 2010. | 10-15378 | |
07/14/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-17988 | |
08/06/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-20424 | |
08/06/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Reply Brief. | 10-20425 | |
08/16/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 10-21103 | |
08/16/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/29/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." | 10-25177 | |
10/26/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-27956 | |
10/26/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/17/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on November 3, 2010. | 10-27956 |