Case Information: 55358 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: REINSTATEMENT OF STEPHEN HACKETT | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - NONE | Classification: | Bar Matter - Reinstatement - Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/15/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/02/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/02/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record of Bar Proceedings. Vols. 1 and 2. | 10-02820 | |
02/02/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Briefing Schedule/Bar Discipline. | 10-02828 | |
03/15/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/26/2011 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Supplement to Record of Disciplinary Proceedings. | 11-02545 | |
02/09/2011 | Order/Dispositional Bar | Filed Order of Reinstatement. Hackett is reinstated to the practice of law, subject to the conditions set forth above. Hackett shall pay the costs of the reinstatement proceedings within 30 days of the date of this order. fn2[Since we grant the petition, the matter is now public, and we direct the clerk to remove the confidential designation.] fn3[ This is our final disposition of this matter. Any new proceedings concerning Hackett shall be docketed under a new docket number.] | 11-04186 | |
03/07/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-06862 | |
03/07/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/14/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Order to Courts. | 11-07696 | |
08/10/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by State Bar on (no date). | 11-06862 |