Case Information: 55349 | |||
Short Caption: | PENNER (KENNETH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C247720 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/29/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-02574 | |
01/29/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/29/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 10-02575 | |
02/02/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 9/18/08 (K. Schmidt), 1/27/09, 3/26/09, 8/25/09, 8/27/09, 12/29/09, 9/2/09, 9/8/09, 9/9/09, 9/10/09 (K. Esparza). Filed in district court on: 1/29/10. | 10-02796 | |
02/16/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/18/08. | 10-04107 | |
02/24/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Court Reporter Kerry Esparza. | 10-04961 | |
02/25/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion and Revising Briefing Schedule. Court Recorder Kerry Esparza's Certificate of Delivery due: April 23, 2010. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 13, 2010. | 10-05027 | |
04/23/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Court Reporter Kerry Esparza. | 10-10633 | |
05/03/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Court Reporter Kerry Esparza's Certificate of Delivery due: May 21, 2010. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 10, 2010. | 10-11202 | |
05/25/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/27/09, 3/26/09, 8/25/09, 8/27/09, 12/29/09, 9/2/09, 9/8/09, 9/9/09, 9/10/09. | 10-13589 | |
06/11/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 17 Page Fast Track Statement. | 10-15132 | |
06/11/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Statement. Via E-Flex. FILED PER ORDER OF 6/15/10. | ||
06/11/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 1. | 10-15134 | |
06/11/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volume 2. | 10-15138 | |
06/15/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. granting motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track statement received via E-Flex on June 11, 2010. | 10-15473 | |
06/15/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 10-15476 | |
07/02/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Excess Pages. Fast Track Response. (16) pages. | 10-17320 | |
07/02/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Received Fast Track Response. (FILED PER ORDER 07/08/10). Via E-Flex. | ||
07/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file the fast track response received via E-Flex on July 2, 2010. | 10-17624 | |
07/08/2010 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 10-17625 | |
11/08/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." | 10-29140 | |
12/03/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-31415 | |
12/03/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on December 9, 2010. | 10-31415 |