judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COLEMAN-TOLL, LP VS. GEORGE L. BROWN INS. AGENCY, INC.

Case Information: 55340
Short Caption:COLEMAN-TOLL, LP VS. GEORGE L. BROWN INS. AGENCY, INC.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0900029Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/08/2010 / Berry, RobertSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/28/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 10-02401
01/28/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
02/01/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Holland & Hart check no. 67002742.
02/08/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Robert G. Berry 10-03436
03/02/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. 10-05511
03/10/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/30/10 10-06303
03/12/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-06541
03/15/2010Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. 10-06746
05/12/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 10-12360
05/12/2010MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. 10-12361
05/26/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH 10-13664
05/26/2010Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.