Case Information: 55341 | |||
Short Caption: | MCINERNEY VS. LAKES CROSSING CENTER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0903196 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/13/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/28/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/28/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 10-02418 | |
02/08/2010 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 10-03495 | |
03/29/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 10-08139 | |
04/13/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 1 of 3. | 10-09581 | |
04/13/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 2 of 3 | 10-09582 | |
04/13/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 3 of 3 | 10-09583 | |
04/13/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/09/2010 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Correct Error, or in the Alternative, Motion to Clarify. | 10-14778 | |
12/15/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion to Correct Error and Directing Response. Response due: 30 days. | 10-32785 | |
01/13/2011 | Motion | Filed Response Pursuant to Order Denying Motion and Directing Response. | 11-01262 | |
02/07/2011 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Reply to Response to Order Denying Motion and Directing Response. | 11-03724 | |
02/09/2011 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Compel. | 11-04280 | |
02/15/2011 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Response to Motion to Compel. | 11-04854 | |
02/16/2011 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion to Compel. | 11-05042 | |
02/24/2011 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Reply to Response to Motion to Compel. | 11-05811 | |
03/03/2011 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Strike. | 11-06609 | |
03/15/2011 | Motion | Filed Response to Appellant's Motion to Strike. | 11-07945 | |
03/24/2011 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Reply to Response to Appellant's Motion to Strike. (Filed in 55341). | 11-09037 | |
03/30/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Cherry, J., dissenting. Fn2 [Appellant has filed a motion to compel. The motion is denied. Appellant's motion to strike respondent's response to the motion to compel is also denied.] | 11-09547 | |
04/11/2011 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Motion for Rehearing. | 11-10729 | |
06/09/2011 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). | 11-17148 | |
06/16/2011 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person En Banc Reconsideration (Appellant). | 11-17952 | |
07/27/2011 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." EN BANC | 11-22585 | |
08/22/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-25534 | |
08/22/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
08/26/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 23, 2011. | 11-25534 | |
09/06/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed August 25, 2011 and placed on the docket as Case No. 11-6151. | 11-26972 | |
10/21/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. | 11-32592 |