judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ADAME VS. DESERT EAGLE CONST.

Case Information: 55360
Short Caption:ADAME VS. DESERT EAGLE CONST.Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV27745Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/04/2010 / Mishel, PersiSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/03/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Jaclyn P. Jackson check no. 6011.
02/03/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 10-02897
02/04/2010Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel 10-03085
02/19/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. Docketing Statement 10-04621
03/05/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 3/19/10 10-05882
03/24/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 10-07710
03/24/2010MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to settlement 10-07712
03/26/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH 10-07935
03/26/2010Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.