Case Information: 55326 | |||
Short Caption: | CLARK VS. SIBEL | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A588540 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Justice Saitta for Justice Hardesty Justice Hardesty for Justice Parraguirre Justice Douglas for Justice Saitta | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | 01/27/2010 / Haberfeld, Stephen | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/11/2011 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/26/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-02191 | |
01/26/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
01/27/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld | 10-02292 | |
01/29/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Shumway Van & Hansen Chtd. - check no. 2219. | ||
02/11/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/2/10 | 10-03818 | |
03/02/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 10-05510 | |
03/09/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-06106 | |
07/29/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-19656 | |
08/10/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 10-20690 | |
09/24/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 10-24602 | |
10/07/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/5/10. To Court Reporter: Renee Vincent. | 10-26246 | |
10/22/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Renee Vincent stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/5/10. | 10-27704 | |
11/03/2010 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File and Serve Opening Brief. | 10-28801 | |
11/03/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice-Motion Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: December 8, 2010. | 10-28803 | |
11/08/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service . Certificate of Mailing: Appellant's Motion for Extension of Tiem to File and Serve Opening Brief & Approval | 10-29152 | |
01/07/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | 11-00763 | |
01/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 11-00767 | |
01/07/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondents Roman A. Sibel, M.D. and Nevada Orthopedic and Spine Center, LLP's Answering Brief. | 11-00765 | |
01/07/2011 | Brief | Filed Respondents John T. Goodsell, D.O., John T. Goodsell, D.O., PC and Gregory Linderer, M.D. dba Anesthesia Associates, Inc.'s Answering Brief. | 11-00852 | |
01/07/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Respondents John T. Goodsell, D.O., John T. Goodsell, D.O., PC and Gregory Linderer, M.D. dba Anesthesia Associates, Inc.'s Answering Brief. | 11-00853 | |
02/03/2011 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | 11-03536 | |
03/11/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 11-07589 | |
03/11/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
07/18/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-21526 | |
08/15/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-24716 | |
08/15/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/25/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 19, 2011. | 11-24716 |