Case Information: 55321 | |||
Short Caption: | PHILLIPS VS. CITY OF N. LAS VEGAS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A582466 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/22/2010 / Trost, Janet | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/12/2011 | How Submitted: | On Record And Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/25/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 10-02017 | |
01/25/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court. | ||
01/25/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 10-02018 | |
01/26/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 10-02086 | |
01/26/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 10-02087 | |
01/27/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Stoval & Associates. Check No. 29578. | ||
01/28/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel | 10-02477 | |
02/12/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-03963 | |
02/12/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -Docketing Statement. | 10-03964 | |
02/16/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 10-03989 | |
02/18/2010 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. Settlement Judge Mishel recuses himself and requests this case be assigned to another settlement judge. | 10-04403 | |
02/22/2010 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Janet Trost | 10-04760 | |
02/23/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement and Confidential Settlement State on Settlement Judge. | 10-04813 | |
03/16/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 4/2/10 | 10-06927 | |
04/07/2010 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 10-08984 | |
04/12/2010 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 45 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 10-09465 | |
05/26/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's First Request to Enlarge Time to File Opening Brief | 10-13648 | |
05/26/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 28, 2010. | 10-13650 | |
06/11/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-15167 | |
06/11/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. | 10-15169 | |
07/09/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Respondent's City of North Las Vegas and Meadowbook Insurance's Answering Brief | 10-17737 | |
02/28/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No reply brief filed. | ||
04/12/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal for Decision without Oral Argument. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the record and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | 11-10850 | |
07/14/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." | 11-21148 | |
08/09/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-23967 | |
08/09/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
08/18/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 16, 2011. | 11-23967 |