Case Information: 55338 | |||
Short Caption: | SALVADOR (CESAR) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C233155 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/28/2011 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/28/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 10-02352 | |
01/28/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/28/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 10-02354 | |
02/01/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment or Order. District Court Order due: 30 days. | 10-02684 | |
02/08/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on January 28, 2010. Judgment of Conviction (Jury Trial). | 10-03500 | |
02/22/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Case Appeal Statement due: 10 days. | 10-04670 | |
02/25/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 10-05053 | |
03/01/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 10-05317 | |
03/12/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-06619 | |
06/07/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | 10-14562 | |
06/11/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. Returned Unfiled Fast Track Statement and copies of Rough Draft Transcripts dated 10/5/09, 10/6/09, 10/7/09, 10/12/09, 10/13/09, 1014/09, and 10/15/09. | 10-15249 | |
06/22/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Brief. and appendix. Corrected brief due: 10 days. | 10-16270 | |
07/02/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Includes appendix consisting of numerous rough draft transcripts and 11 CDs/DVDs. (OPENING BRIEF FILED and APPENDIX DETACHED AND FILED PER ORDER 11/09/10). | ||
11/09/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We direct the clerk of this court to detach and file the appendix submitted with the opening brief. We further direct the clerk of this court to file the opening brief. Answering Brief due: 30 days. The clerk of this court shall file the disc bearing the notation "Amended Information" and return the remaining compact discs submitted with the opening brief. Appellant's CD-ROM with the remaining parts of the appendix (namely, the trial transcripts) due: 10 days. | 10-29299 | |
11/09/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-29302 | |
11/09/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 10-29303 | |
11/29/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time to File Trial Transcripts on CD-ROM. | 10-30910 | |
12/01/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant's CD-ROM due: 30 days. | 10-31222 | |
12/09/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion for Extension of Time (33 days). (Answering Brief). | 10-32217 | |
12/10/2010 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Other. CD-ROM of Trial Transcripts. (Per Order filed 12/1/10). | 10-32336 | |
12/16/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion and Regarding Service of Appellant's Appendix. Answsering brief due January 11, 2011. Appellant: 15 days to file a certificate of service. | 10-32932 | |
01/11/2011 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time Second Request. (Answering Brief). | 11-01103 | |
01/14/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Admonishing Counsel for Appellant and Granting Extension of Time. Answering Brief due: January 21, 2011. | 11-01486 | |
01/21/2011 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 11-02131 | |
01/21/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. | 11-02132 | |
01/21/2011 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief Respondent's Appendix Vol. 2, Part 1 | 11-02133 | |
03/08/2011 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening. No Reply Brief filed. | ||
03/28/2011 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting for Decision without Oral Arguments. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 11-09284 | |
03/28/2011 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/08/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." | 11-16846 | |
07/05/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 11-19776 | |
07/05/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
07/18/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 12, 2011. | 11-19776 |