Case Information: 55337 | |||
Short Caption: | DREW VS. DIST. CT. (MANPOWER, INC.) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49334 , 51265 , 52082 , 52129 , 55141 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A486900 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/27/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/27/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for a Writ of Prohibition and/or a Writ of Mandamus. | 10-02326 | |
05/03/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 15 days. | 10-11305 | |
05/20/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Party in Interest Manpower of Southern Nevada's Response to Order Directing Answer. | 10-13236 | |
07/20/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "We therefore deny Drew's writ petition in Docket No. 55337." SNP10-JH/MD/KP Nos. 52129/55337. | 10-18689 | |
08/03/2010 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Appellant/Workers' Compensation Claimant's Petition for Rehearing/Reconsideration, or Rehearing En Banc. Nos. 52129/55337 (Not consolidated) | 10-20062 | |
09/14/2010 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. NRAP 40(c). Nos. 52129/55337. | 10-23545 | |
10/11/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu/Rehearing of Remittitur | 10-26554 | |
10/11/2010 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
03/23/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Filed. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on December 11, 2010 and placed on the docket March 18, 2011 as Case No. 10-9556. | 11-08871 | |
05/26/2011 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. | 11-15608 |