Case Information: 55332 | |||
Short Caption: | SEIFF VS. DIST. CT. (WILLICK LAW GROUP) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 54840 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D361633 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Chief Justice Pickering for Justice Parraguirre Justice Douglas for Justice Saitta | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/27/2010 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Gary Logan check no. 11307. | ||
01/27/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, for Writ of Mandamus. | 10-02243 | |
01/27/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Stay. | 10-02244 | |
03/10/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Stay and Directing Answer. Answer due: 30 days. | 10-06194 | |
04/08/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Real Party in Interest on Behalf of Respondents' Answer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition | 10-09221 | |
04/09/2010 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibit (original). Volume 1 | 10-09249 | |
04/09/2010 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibit (original). Volume 2 | 10-09250 | |
04/09/2010 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibit (original). Volume 3 | 10-09254 | |
04/09/2010 | Exhibit | Filed Exhibit (original). Volume 4 | 10-09255 | |
10/15/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Briefing. Petitioner: 30 days to file a supplement the petition. Willick may file any response to the supplement within 30 days from service of the supplement. | 10-27038 | |
11/10/2010 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief. Petitioner's Supplemental Brief. | 10-29523 | |
12/03/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion To Compel Production of Documents. | 10-31496 | |
12/13/2010 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Brief. Response to Petitioner's Supplemental Brief. | 10-32366 | |
02/03/2011 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Denying Petition. "ORDER the petition DENIED." fn1[We deny their (real parties in interest) motion to compel.] | 11-03504 | |
02/28/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur | 11-05972 | |
02/28/2011 | Case Status Update | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |