judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BESHEAR VS. BESHEAR

Case Information: 36305
Short Caption:BESHEAR VS. BESHEARCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D238681Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/18/2000 / Pomrenze, SandraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/19/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Pike & Associates--check no. 1587.
06/19/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10414
06/26/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas F. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/17/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-12265
08/04/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal pursuant to NRAP Rule 4 and EDCR 2.24(b). (LV drop box--8/3/00) 00-13529
09/13/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. A conflict has arisen and the case will need to be assigned to a new settlement judge. 00-16158
09/18/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Settlement Judge Reassignment. New Settlement Judge: Sandra L. Pomrenze.
11/20/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Carolyn Ellsworth, Esq. Hereby agrees to represent the Plaintiff, James Beshear, in the above-entitled action in the place and stead of Randall H. Pike, Esq. 00-20297
11/22/2000Notice/Outgoing Letter. Sandra Pomrenze.
11/22/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: December 11, 2000. 00-20569
12/06/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Remand. 00-21294
12/15/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-21973
02/05/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-02322
02/20/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. fn1[Respondent's July 17, 2000 motion to dismiss this appeal and appellant's December 6, 2000 motion for remand are denied as moot. SNP/CLK 01-03106
02/20/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.