judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: CARY M. MCCALLISTER

Case Information: 10-BG-1163
Short Caption:IN RE: CARY M. MCCALLISTERClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN294-10Filed Date:09/17/2010

Opening Event Date:09/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentCary M. Mccallister NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/17/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of an order of criminal judgment regarding respondent. Respondent pled guilty to Driving While Intoxicated in the General District Court of Alexandria, Va.
09/29/2010ORDER On consideration of the certified copy of respondent's guilty plea in the General District Court for Alexandria, Virginia to driving while intoxicated, it is hereby ORDERED pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (e), that Bar Counsel shall investigate the matter and proceed as appropriate under D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 8, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel shall inform the court if the matter is resolved without the necessity of further court action. (ETW)
05/13/2011LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court that this matter has been resolved without the necessity of further court action.
05/17/2011DISMISSED On consideration of the letter from the Office of Bar Counsel dated May 13, 2011, advising the court that Bar Counsel has disposed of this matter pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 6 (a)(3), it is ORDERED that this matter is hereby closed. (ETW)