Case Information: 55336 | |||
Short Caption: | ROMERO (ESTEVAN) VS. DIST. CT. (STATE) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Churchill Co. - Tenth Judicial District - 32222 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/27/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/27/2010 | Petition/Writ | Filed Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | 10-02305 | |
02/12/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to Respond. The State of Nevada's Response is due: 30 days. | 10-03942 | |
02/22/2010 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 10-04676 | |
04/07/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. "ORDER the petition GRANTED AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF MANDAMUS instructing the district court to place the August 17, 2007 habeas corpus petition on its calendar and resolve the petition as set for above." fn2[To ensure all parties have a copy of the petition, it is attached to this order.] | 10-08996 | |
04/07/2010 | Writ | Issued Writ. Certified copy of writ and order mailed to Hon. David A. Huff, District Judge, by this office. | 10-09050 | |
04/07/2010 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Hon. David A. Huff, District Judge, by mail from this office on this day. | 10-09050 | |
05/03/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 10-09620 | |
05/03/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |