judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STERN VS. MCKENNA C/W 55334

Case Information: 55335
Short Caption:STERN VS. MCKENNA C/W 55334Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 55334 *, 55335
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A516652Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/15/2010How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/27/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
01/27/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 10-02276
01/27/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days 10-02277
01/27/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 10-02315
02/03/2010BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 10-03045
02/03/2010Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Cecilia Stern - money order no. 0645731261.
02/10/2010Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Proof of Service for Civil Pro Per Appeal Statement. 10-03717
06/04/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. and Directing Transmission of Record. District Court Nos. A510124 and A516652. Nos. 55334/55335 (10-14484).
06/11/2010Other Incoming DocumentFiled Proper Person Document. Letter from appellant Cecila Stern regarding counsel. Nos. 55334/55335 (10-15271).
06/15/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 1 of 8 (via FTP) 10-15561
06/15/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 2 of 8 (via FTP) 10-15562
06/15/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 3 of 8 (via FTP) 10-15563
06/15/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 4 of 8 (via FTP) 10-15565
06/15/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 5 of 8 (via FTP) 10-15566
06/15/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 6 of 8 (via FTP) 10-15567
06/15/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 7 of 8 (via FTP) 10-15568
06/15/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vol. 8 of 8 (via FTP) 10-15569
06/15/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
07/07/2010Other Returned Mail. Order filed 6/4/10 addressed to Yves Pirez. Per USPS, "return to sender, not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward". Writing on envelope says "moved 5/1/10. Nos. 55334/55335. (10-17594)
01/10/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order to Show Cause. Response due: 20 days. 11-00892
01/20/2011Letter/IncomingFiled Proper Person Letter in Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 55334/55335. 11-02045
12/09/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." Fn2[We have considered appellant's remaining arguments and determine that they are without merit.] Fn3[The Honorable Robert E. Rose and the Honorable Miriam Shearing, Senior Justices, participated in the decision of this matter under general order of assignment.] Nos. 55334/55335 11-37710
12/22/2011MotionFiled Proper Person Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition of Rehearing. Nos. 55334/55335. 11-39456
12/22/2011Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 55334/55335. 11-39990
12/23/2011Filing FeeRehearing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Cecilia Stern - Money Order No. 19223845110. Nos. 55334/55335.
12/23/2011Letter/IncomingFiled Proper person letter (with attachments) requesting extension to file petition for rehearing. Nos. 55334/55335. 11-39579
01/06/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Petition for rehearing due: 30 days. Nos. 55334/55335. 12-00634
02/03/2012Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Nos. 55334/55335. 12-03747
05/17/2012Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying Rehearing. "Rehearing Denied." NRAP 40(c). Fn1[The Honorables Robert Rose and Miriam Shearing, Senior Justices, participated in the decisions of this matter under general orders of assignment.] Nos. 55334/55335 12-15769
05/30/2012MotionFiled Proper Person Motion - Request for an Extension of Time to File Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos 55334/55335. 12-16995
06/01/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Ms. Stern shall have until June 13, 2012, to file her petition for en banc reconsideration. Nos. 55334/55335. 12-17244
06/08/2012MotionFiled Proper Person Motion - (Second) Request for an Extension of Time to File Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Nos 55334/55335. 12-18136
06/14/2012Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Ms. Stern shall have until June 29, 2012, to file her petition for en banc reconsideration. Nos. 55334/55335. 12-18750
06/15/2012Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Appellant's Proper Person Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. 12-18911
09/19/2012Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." Fn1[The Honorable James Hardesty, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] Nos. 5534/55335. EN BANC 12-29656
10/15/2012RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 12-32647
10/15/2012Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
10/29/2012RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on October 22, 2012. Nos. 55334/55335 12-32647
11/26/2012Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter to Cecilia Stern returning, unfiled, documents received on November 21, 2012. 12-37161