judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ORTIZ (JONAS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 55328
Short Caption:ORTIZ (JONAS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 74394 , 74394-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C090208Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
01/27/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 10-02225
01/27/2010Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/11/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP. 10-06396
04/07/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-07078
04/07/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 9, 2010. 10-07078