Case Information: 55322 | |||
Short Caption: | SAINTAL (PRISCELLA) VS. STATE C/W 55323/55324 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 55322*, 55323 , 55324 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C123256 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Direct/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/25/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 10-02028 | |
01/25/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/11/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. "ORDER these appeals DISMISSED." SNP10-JH/MD/RP. Nos. 55322/55323/55324. | 10-06388 | |
04/07/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-07088 | |
04/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/15/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 9, 2010. | 10-07088 |