Case Information: 49643 | |||
Short Caption: | WHITE VS. NEVADA DEP'T. OF CORRECTIONS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 0600870A | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/21/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/19/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/19/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-13212 | |
06/29/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. | 07-14255 | |
09/21/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-20911 | |
09/21/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/09/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD. | 07-24568 | |
12/04/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-26078 | |
12/04/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/10/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 5, 2007. | 07-26078 |