judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GALLEGOS (MAGDALENO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49633
Short Caption:GALLEGOS (MAGDALENO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41872
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR020688Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:HardestyCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/04/2008How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/15/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/15/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 07-13113
06/15/2007Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice James W. Hardesty sat in district court proceedings. 07-13114
06/29/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 07-14257
10/01/2007Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 3. 07-21621
10/01/2007Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/07/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order. of Limited Remand for Appointment of Counsel. District court order due: 35 days. fn1Petitoner should proceed by and through his appointed counsel in this appeal.] 08-11367
05/16/2008Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on May 14, 2008 appointing Mary Lou Wilson, Esq. as counsel for appellant. 08-12442
05/16/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 15 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days 08-12450
05/19/2008Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 05/14/08. (Appointment of Counsel). 08-12504
05/28/2008Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 08-13393
05/28/2008Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 08-13396
05/28/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. 08-13406
05/30/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. - Docketing Statement. 08-13671
09/04/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. 08-22794
09/04/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 08-22795
10/07/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. 08-25883
11/04/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Nonreply and Reliance Upon Appellant's Opening Brief. 08-28163
11/04/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. No Reply Brief filed.
07/31/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP 09-18738
08/25/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-19195
08/25/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/09/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 1, 2009. 09-19195