Case Information: 49632 | |||
Short Caption: | SKEES (WAYNE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48835 , 53105 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR061647 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
06/15/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
06/15/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 07-13111 | |
07/09/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP07-RP/JH/NS. | 07-14932 | |
08/03/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-15597 | |
08/03/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
08/10/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 6, 2007. | 07-15597 |