Case Information: 55345 | |||
Short Caption: | DAVIS (SEAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CR0907055 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
01/28/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 10-02495 | |
01/28/2010 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/28/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. | 10-02496 | |
02/11/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 8/13/09, 9/14/09, 11/02/09, 12/14/09, and 1/11/10. Court Reporter: JoAnn Malone. Filed in district court on: 1/28/10. | 10-03770 | |
02/17/2010 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 8/13/09, 9/14/09, 11/02/09, 12/14/09, 12/21/09, 1/11/10, and 1/25/10. Transcriptionist: Michelle Knutsen. | 10-04143 | |
03/09/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 10-06144 | |
03/11/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Extending Time. Fast track statement and appendix due: April 8, 2010. | 10-06519 | |
04/09/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 10-09350 | |
05/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. Cause appearing, the motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP. | 10-12072 | |
05/10/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |