Case Information: 51389 | |||
Short Caption: | GONZALEZ (GERONIMO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Pershing Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - CR0710299 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 08-08661 | |
05/20/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 27, 2008. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-12624 | |
05/21/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-12752 | |
05/21/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 08-12756 | |
05/21/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Fast Track Statement and Appendix. Due date: 10 days. | 08-12759 | |
05/23/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Appellant's Fast Track Statement served on respondent. | 08-13065 | |
06/26/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . Fast Track Response due: 10 days or show cause. | 08-16285 | |
07/01/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-16751 | |
07/01/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 08-16752 | |
01/22/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-01700 | |
02/17/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-02110 | |
02/17/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/27/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 18, 2009. | 09-02110 |