Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Bruce L. Gale check no. 2493. | | |
04/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | | 08-08648 |
04/08/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice Maupin. (Kravitz, Schnitzer, Sloane, Johnson & Eberhardy, Chtd.) | | 08-08715 |
04/08/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. (Kravitz, Schnitzer, Sloane, Johnson & Eberhardy, Chtd.) | | |
04/11/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Paul Richitt Jr. | | 08-09066 |
05/13/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 6/19/08. | | 08-11870 |
05/13/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | | 08-12040 |
05/29/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | | 08-13584 |
05/29/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. Docketing Statement. | | 08-13585 |
06/03/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. | | 08-13919 |
06/03/2008 | Filing Fee | Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 2531 returned to Bruce L. Gale. Filing fee previously paid. | | |
06/11/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | | 08-14847 |
06/19/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 7/11/08. | | 08-15734 |
07/23/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | | 08-18975 |
07/25/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | | 08-19301 |
08/27/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. | | 08-22047 |
09/10/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/28/08, 2/11/08. To Court Reporter: Kerry Esparza. | | 08-23362 |
10/27/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Enlargement or Extension of Time Regarding this Court's July 25, 2008 Order (First Request). | | 08-27499 |
11/12/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Respondent Miyoko Asayama's Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Enlargement or Extension of Time Regarding this Court's July 25, 2008 Order. | | 08-28791 |
11/20/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion and Regarding Transcripts. Opening Brief due 12/22/08. To date, Ms. Esparza has not filed the required certificate. Certificate due 30 days. Fn2 [. . .A copy of the transcript request form is attached to this order.] | | 08-29723 |
11/26/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/28/08, 2/11/08. | | 08-30213 |
12/03/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Amended Certificate of Service from Kerry Esparza stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/28/08 and 2/11/08. | | 08-30762 |
12/04/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Respondent Miyoko Asayama's Motion for Reconsideration or Modification of the Court's November 20, 2008 Order Pursuant to NRAP 27(b) or in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss the Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 9(a)(3). | | 08-30904 |
12/17/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent Miyoko Asayama's Motion for Reconsideration or Modification of the Court's November 20, 2008 Order Pursuant to NRAP 27(b), or in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss the Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 9(a)(3). | | 08-31954 |
12/17/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata. Appellant's Errata to Appellant's Opposition to Respondent Miyoko Asayama's Motion for Reconsideration or Modification of the Court's November 20, 2008 Order Pursuant to NRAP 27(b), or in the Alternative Motion to Dismiss the Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 9(a)(3). | | 08-31955 |
12/24/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Enlargement or Extension of Time Regarding this Court's November 20, 2008 Order Granting Motion and Regarding Transcripts (First Request.) | | 08-32683 |
01/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion for Reconsideration and Granting Motion. The motion for reconsideration is denied. Respondent's motion for sanctions and/or to dismiss this appeal is denied. The clerk shall file the appendix to the opening brief received on December 26, 2008. Opening brief due 30 days. | | 09-01921 |
01/23/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. - PER ORDER FILED 9/28/09 - The clerk of this court is directed to strike pages 262 through 292 and 328 through 332 of appellant's appendix. | | 08-32767 |
01/23/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. PER ORDER OF 9/28/09 - The clerk of this court shall strike the following material from appellant's opening brief: Argument Section II, page 22, line 17 to page 26, line 23 and Section IV, page 27, line 26 to page 31, line 15. | | 09-01951 |
03/05/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Answering Brief. Respondent Asayama | | 09-05725 |
03/26/2009 | Appendix | Received Appendix. Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. FILED PER ORDER OF 4/20/09. | | 09-07633 |
03/27/2009 | Brief | Received Answering Brief. FILED PER ORDER OF 4/20/09. | | 09-07729 |
03/31/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. of respondent, Miyoko Asayama. | | 09-08028 |
04/01/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Strike. Respondent, Miyoko Asayama's Motion to Strike Appellant, Linda Harris' Opening Brief. | | 09-08159 |
04/13/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant Linda Marie Harris' Opposition to Respondent Miyoko Asayama's Motion to Extend Time for Filing Opening Brief of Respondent Miyoko Asayama, and Appellant Linda Marie Harris' Motion for Confession of Error and Appropriate Disposition ot Appellant Linda Marie Harris' Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 31(c). | | 09-09136 |
04/13/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Linda Marie Harris' Motion for Enlargement or Extension of Time Regarding Appellant Linda Marie Harris' Opposition to Respondent Miyoko Asayama's Motion to Strike Appellant Linda Marie Harris' Opening Brief (First Request). | | 09-09139 |
04/16/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Linda Marie Harris' Motion for Englargement or Extension of Time Regarding Appellant Linda Marie Harris' Opposition to Respondent Miyoko Asayama's Motion to Extend Time for Filing Opening Brief of Respondent Miyoko Asayama. (First Request) | | 09-09528 |
04/20/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. to Show Cause and Granting Motions to Extend Time. Appellant: 20 days to show cause. Respondent may file any reply within 10 from the date that appellant's response is served. The briefing schedule in this appeal shall be suspended pending further order of this court. We grant appellant's April 13 and 16, 2009, motions to extend time to file her opposition to respondent's motion. Having considered appellant's opposition, we nevertheless grant respondent's March 31, 2009, motion to extend the time for the filing of her answering brief and appendices, and we deny appellant's April 13, 2009, motion for confession of error. The clerk of this court shall file respondent's answering brief and appendices, which were provisionally received on March 26 and 27, 2009. Finally, we defer ruling on respondent's April 1, 2009, motion to strike portions of appellant's opening brief. | | 09-09783 |
04/20/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Answering Brief. Vols. 1 and 2. | | 09-07633 |
04/20/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | | 09-07729 |
04/23/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Opposition to Appellant Harris' Motions for Extensions of Time Filed on April 4 and 14, 2009 and Opposition to Appellant Harris' Motion for Confession of Error and Disposition of Harris' Appeal Pursuant to NRAP 31 (c) and Countermotion for Sanctions. | | 09-10112 |
05/13/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant Linda Marie Harris' Brief in Response to This Court's Order to Show Cause and Granting Motions to Extend Time Filed on Monday, April 20, 2009. | | 09-11814 |
07/16/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time for Filing Respondent, Miyoko Asayama's Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. | | 09-17445 |
08/10/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. (Jane Eberhardy) | | 09-19424 |
09/11/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. - Copy of Substitution of Attorneys filed in district court. | | 09-22087 |
09/28/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Dismissing Appeal in Part and Granting in Part Motion to Strike. We hereby dismiss this appeal to the extent that it challenges the district court's April 18, 2008, order denying reconsideration and NRCP 60 (b) relief. We grant respondent's motion to strike, in part. The clerk of this court shall strike the following material from appellant's opening brief: Argument Section II, page 22, line 17 to page 26, line 23 and Section IV, page 27, line 26 to page 31, line 15. Additionally, the clerk of this court is directed to strike pages 262 through 292 and 328 through 332 of appellant's appendix. As to respondent's request that the opening brief be stricken for failure to comply with NRAP 28, that request is denied. Fn1 [On July 16, 2009, respondent filed a motion to extend the time for filing her reply to appellant's response to our April 20 order to show cause, contending that she never received a copy of the response and other documents from appellant. We grant respondent's motion and direct the clerk of this court to file respondent's reply that was provisionally received on July 16, 2009.] Fn2 [. . . We further deny respondent's countermotion for sanctions contained in this April 23 filing, which sought sanctions against appellant for filing the motions for extensions of time and the motion for confession of error.] Fn3 [Because the Law Offices of Arthur W. Tuverson are already listed as respondent's counsel of record on appeal, we conclude that no action need be taken on the September 11, 2009, notice of substitution of counsel submitted by respondent.] | | 09-23598 |
09/28/2009 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent Asayama's Reply to Appellant Harris' Response to this Court's Order to Show Cause and Countermotions for Confession of Errors as to Asayama's April 1, 2009 Motion to Strike and April 23, 2009 Countermotion for Sanctions. | | 09-17447 |
11/02/2009 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | | 09-26748 |
01/07/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Oral argument will not be scheduled in this appeal, and it shall stand submitted on the recored and the briefs filed herein, as of the date of this order. | | 10-00476 |
01/07/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
03/01/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Las Vegas on April 5, 2010 at 1:30 p.m. (En Banc) | | 10-05342 |
03/24/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 10-07730 |
04/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. | | |
12/16/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Order of Affirmance. Because Harris's only appellate argument is raised for the first time on appeal, we will not conisder it, "we necessarily affirm the district court's dismissal of her case." Cherry, J., dissenting. | | 10-32882 |
12/30/2010 | Motion | Filed Respondent's Miyoko Asayama's Verified Memorandum of Costs Pursuant to NRAP 39. | | 10-34188 |
01/05/2011 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Appellant. | | 11-00464 |
01/05/2011 | Filing Fee | Rehearing Fee Paid. $150.00 from Bruce L. Gale - check no. 3105. | | |
02/23/2011 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying Rehearing. "ORDER the Petition DENIED." fn1[We defer ruling on respondent's requests for costs.] | | 11-05658 |
03/21/2011 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | | 11-08591 |
03/21/2011 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
04/05/2011 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on March 28, 2011. | | 11-08591 |
10/06/2014 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Costs are hereby taxed against appellant. Respondent is awarded costs in the amount of $376.11. The district court clerk is directed to add the statement of costs to the remitittur. | | 14-33069 |