Case Information: 51391 | |||
Short Caption: | LASSETTER (BRIAN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49024 , 53841 , 54111 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C211826 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/07/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
04/07/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-08690 | |
05/01/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD | 08-10866 | |
05/27/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-11756 | |
05/27/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/11/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 29, 2008. | 08-11756 |