judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CAMERON (WAYNE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32139
Short Caption:CAMERON (WAYNE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 26291
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C115324Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/08/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/13/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
04/13/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
04/20/1998Other Other. Filed Certified Copy of Second Notice of Appeal.
04/29/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings, in each of the above-identified appeals. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32139, 32140, 32141, 32182, 32190, 32219, 32220, 32227.
04/30/1998Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Proper person pro se Appellant Opening Brief. (Received the original and 4 copies 1 returned to Appellant). RETURNED UNFILED 5/13/98.
05/06/1998Other Other. Filed Entry of Appearance of Counsel. Clark County Public Defender as counsel for appellant. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.)
05/13/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Appellant filed the notice of appeal in proper person, and on April 30, 1998, appellant submitted a proper person opening brief. On May 6, 1998, appellant's counsel filed a notice of appearance. Appellant is now represented by counsel and has not been granted permission to file documents in proper person. We direct the clerk to return unfiled appellant's proper person opening brief.
05/13/1998Other Other. Returned unfiled with letter: original proper person pro se Appellant Opening Brief.
05/14/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement.
05/18/1998Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Court Reporter: Laurie Webb.
06/03/1998TranscriptFiled Transcript. Court Reporter: Felicia Rene Zabin.
06/09/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Because appellant is no longer proceeding in proper person, we vacate our order filed April 29, 1998, directing the clerk of the district court to transmit the trial court record.
08/06/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief. (Mailed on: Express-No Postmark.)
08/06/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Appendix.
09/08/1998BriefFiled Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. (Mailed on: Express-No postmark.)
10/08/1998BriefFiled Brief. Appellant's Reply Brief. (Mailed on: express mail-no postmark).
10/08/1998Other Other. Case submitted on briefs this day.
10/08/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/31/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/31/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Appellant shall have 20 days to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed. Appellant should specifically address whether he has completed his sentence and whether the issue presented by this appeal is moot. 00-15421
09/11/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 00-15931
10/02/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP00A-RR/CY/NB 00-17275
10/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-17357
10/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/04/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 13, 2000. 00-17357