judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DARNELL STANLEY V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1154
Short Caption:DARNELL STANLEY V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Mot. To Seal Arr. Rec.
Lead: 10-CO-1148 Consolidated:10-CO-1154
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL2529-78Filed Date:09/08/2010

Opening Event Date:09/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/12/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/16/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDarnell Stanley Y
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/23/2010ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 10-CO-1148 and 10-CO-1154 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record indexes and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
10/12/2010RECORD INDEX (10CO1154)
10/12/2010RECORD COPIES (10CO1154)
10/12/2010RECORD INDEX (10CO1148)
10/12/2010RECORD COPIES (10CO1148)
10/12/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
11/12/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF
11/12/2010APPENDIX to Appellant's Brief.
12/17/2010APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
12/28/2010TMC - motion for summary affirmance - (LODGED) opposition
02/04/2011RECEIVED-appellant's opposition to motion for summary affirmance LW
02/22/2011 ORDERED, SS, that the Clerk SHALL FILE the lodged opposition. It is *****MORE*****
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to summary affirmance
02/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED since the trial court properly applied DC Code 16-801, et seq (2001) in reviewing appellant's motion to expunge his prior arrests or seal his arrest record and appellant ;filaed to establish his entitlement to relief uner either the statute or DC Super Ct. Crim R. 118... SEE HARDCOPY It is ****MORE****
02/22/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the orders on appeal be and hereby are AFFIRMED. (GLTHKG) (rm)
03/16/2011MANDATE ISSUED