Case Information: 51424 | |||
Short Caption: | BROTT VS. CATALDO | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45149 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A427970 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Douglas | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/17/2008 / Mishel, Persi | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
04/14/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Benjamin B. Childs, Ltd. check no. 11101 | ||
04/14/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-09225 | |
04/14/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
04/17/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Persi J. Mishel. | 08-09668 | |
04/29/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-10665 | |
05/13/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. The parties have presented good cause showing this appeal is not appropriate for mediation and should proceed to briefing. | 08-11879 | |
07/10/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-17608 | |
07/23/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 08-19004 | |
07/25/2008 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 08-19250 | |
07/25/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 08-19252 | |
08/25/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-21807 | |
08/28/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-22188 | |
10/02/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "AFFIRM the district court's order." NNP08C-MC/WM/NS | 08-25423 | |
10/14/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Entry of Order. | 08-26524 | |
10/20/2008 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for Rehearing. Appellant | 08-26995 | |
10/20/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $150 from Benjamin b. Childs, LTD. Check no. 11375. | ||
11/13/2008 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." NRAP 40(c). | 08-28854 | |
11/26/2008 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Appellants'. | 08-30203 | |
12/09/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-29427 | |
12/09/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/En Banc Reconsideration Pending. | ||
12/18/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 11, 2008. (REMITTITUR RECALLED/CASE REOPENED). | 08-29427 | |
01/08/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. Respondent's Answer due: 15 days. We recall the remttitur and stay its issuance pending resolution of the petition for en banc reconsideration. | 09-00477 | |
01/27/2009 | Post-Judgment Petition | Filed Answer to Petition for En Banc Reconsideration. | 09-02328 | |
04/08/2009 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order Denying En Banc Reconsideration. Having considered the petition on file herein, we have concluded that en banc reconsideration is not warranted. NRAP 40A. Accordingly, we "ORDER the petition DENIED." Fn2 [The Honorable Michael L. Douglas, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this matter.] EN BANC. | 09-08755 | |
05/05/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-09665 | |
05/05/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/20/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 12, 2009. | 09-09665 |