judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCCALLUM (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 49487
Short Caption:MCCALLUM (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C214872Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/21/2007Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/21/2007Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 07-11169
05/29/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/24/06 and 12/12/06. Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. Filed in district court on: 05/16/07. 07-11727
05/29/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/06/05, 10/11/05, 03/09/06, 05/04/06, 11/07/06, 11/09/06, 11/14/06, 11/14/06, 11/21/06, 12/05/06, 02/22/07, and 05/03/07. Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. Filed in district court on: 05/16/07. 07-11731
05/29/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 03/28/06, 04/25/06, and 05/25/06. Court Reporter: Carlaya Lewis. Filed in district court on: 05/16/07. 07-11734
06/04/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/06/05, 10/11/05, 03/09/06, 05/04/06, 11/07/06, 11/09/06, 11/14/06, 11/14/06, 11/21/06, 12/05/06, 02/22/07, and 05/03/07. Court Reporter: Lisa Lizotte. 07-12199
06/20/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 08/01/05. Court Reporter: Bill Nelson. Not filed in district court. 07-13451
06/20/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 07/19/05, 07/27/05, 08/10/05, and 08/15/05. Court Reporter: T. Ferriola. Not filed in district court. 07-13453
06/20/2007Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 07/11/05. Court Reporter: R. Mac Donald. Not filed in district court. 07-13454
06/20/2007MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion for Full Briefing, or in the Alternative, Enlargement of Time to File Fast Track Statement. 07-13481
07/06/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. for Full Briefing and Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Fast Track Statement due: 20 days from filing of the transcripts. 07-14795
07/13/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 8/1/05. Court Reporter: Bill Nelson. 07-15227
07/19/2007Order/Procedural Order. Court Reporter Therese Ferriola shall submit the requested transcripts to the clerk of this court within 10 days of this order. 07-15819
07/19/2007Order/Procedural Order. Court Reporter Carlaya Lewis shall submit the requested transcripts to the clerk of this court within 10 days of this order. 07-15820
07/19/2007Order/Procedural Order. Court Reporter R. MacDonald shall submit the requested transcripts to the clerk of this court within 10 days of this order. 07-15822
07/25/2007TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 03/28/06, 04/25/06, 05/25/06, 10/24/06, and 12/12/06. Court Reporter: Rachelle Hamilton. 07-16331
08/02/2007TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 7/11/05. Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald. 07-16993
08/30/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Ms. Ferriola: 10 days to file requested transcripts or show cause why she should not be sanctioned. 07-19189
10/01/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Imposing Sanctions. $100 due to Supreme Court Law Library: 20 days. Transcripts due: 10 days. 07-21538
10/30/2007Other Returned Mail. Order filed 10/01/07, sent by certified mail to court reporter Therese Ferriola re-mailed to address located on the Certified Court Reporters Board website. The website also, showed this court reporter as being suspended. 07-23818
11/06/2007Other Returned Mail. Order filed 10/01/07, re-mailed on 10/30/07 to updated addresss (by certified and regular mail) for Therese Ferriola returned. No forwarding address. 07-24274
11/29/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. it appears that court reporter Ferriola has been suspended by the Certified Court Reporters Board and has failed to provide a current address. We therefore conclude that the transcripts requested from Ferriola are unavailable. NRAP 9(d) requires counsel for appellant to prepare, file in the district court, and serve upon counsel for the State a statement of the proceedings pursuant to NRAP 9(d). After service of appellant's proposed statement, counsel for the State may within 10 days file in the district court and serve upon counsel for appellant any objections or proposed amendments to the statement. Thereafter, the district court has 10 days under the rule within which to settle and approve the statement and to direct the clerk of the district court to include the statement in the trial court record. Counsel for appellant: 10 days from the date of this order within which to file a written response regarding the necessity of justice court transcripts. 07-25798
12/06/2007MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to November 29, 2007 Court Order. 07-26414
12/20/2007Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We note that the unavailable transcripts merely concern calendar call proceedings, and we conclude that the transcripts filed in this appeal are sufficient for this court to effectively review appellant's potential assignments of error. Fast Track Statement due: 20 days. 07-27544
01/04/2008Other Returned Mail. Order filed 10/01/07, addressed to court reporter Therese Ferriola at her mother's address returned. No forwarding address. 08-00350
01/17/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 08-01320
01/24/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on January 17, 2008. 08-01824
01/24/2008Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 08-01327
01/24/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 08-01328
02/15/2008Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 08-03854
03/06/2008Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP08-JH/RP/MD 08-05669
04/01/2008RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 08-07634
04/01/2008Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/08/2008RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 2, 2008. 08-07634