Case Information: 49488 | |||
Short Caption: | CADLE COMPANY II, INC. VS. FOUNTAIN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0402634 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 06/06/2007 / Berkson, Lester | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | 11/14/2008 at 11:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Carson City |
Submission Date: | 11/14/2008 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/21/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Woodburn & Wedge--check no. 080405. | ||
05/21/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-11172 | |
06/01/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-12109 | |
06/06/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lester H. Berkson. | 07-12305 | |
06/22/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-13734 | |
08/31/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 07-19321 | |
09/12/2007 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. | 07-20101 | |
09/13/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 04/23/07. To Court Reporter: Sunshine Reporting Services. | 07-20273 | |
09/19/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 04/23/07. Court Reporter: Eric Nelson. | 07-20716 | |
11/29/2007 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 07-25820 | |
11/29/2007 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Vols. 1 and 2. | 07-25822 | |
01/03/2008 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 08-00260 | |
01/16/2008 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 08-01218 | |
09/26/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on November 13, 2008 at 11:30 a.m. (NNP08G-WM/MC/NS) | 08-24924 | |
10/29/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 08-27759 | |
11/14/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | ||
02/26/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MC/NS/MG. | 09-05059 | |
03/24/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-06299 | |
03/24/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/01/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 25, 2009. | 09-06299 |