Events |
Event Date | Status | Description | Result |
09/10/2010 | | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
09/23/2010 | | ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEAL no. 10-CO-1155 with previously consolidated appeals nos. 10-CF-609, 10-CF-637 and 10-CF-852 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Robert Hollander, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in appeal no. 10-CO-1155. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC) | |
09/23/2010 | | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Robert Hollander, Esquire | |
10/25/2010 | | RECORD INDEX (10CO1155) | |
10/25/2010 | | RECORD COPIES (10CO1155) | |
11/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (15 pgs/tape) 2/1/10 proc. | |
11/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (31 pgs/tape) 2/19/10 proc. | |
11/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #11 (10 pgs/tape) 3/26/10 proc. | |
11/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #12 (8 pgs/tape) 4/12/10 proc. | |
11/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #13 (102 pgs/Coney) 4/15/10 proc. | |
11/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #14 (17 pgs/tape) 6/24/10 proc. | |
11/16/2010 | | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #15 (15 pgs/tape) 12/9/10 proc. w/cd | |
11/16/2010 | | RECORD COMPLETED | |
11/18/2010 | | It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellants' briefs and the limited appendixes including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo) | |
12/23/2010 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 90 days (SHORT) | |
12/27/2010 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Shorter)no oppo 30 days | |
12/28/2010 | | APPELLANT'S BRIEF (Weaver) | |
12/28/2010 | | APPENDIX (Weaver) | |
01/10/2011 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF by 60 days (D. Shorter)(unopposed) | |
01/11/2011 | | On consideration of appellant Leonard Delonte Short's unopposed motion for extension of time to file the brief, and the unopposed motion of appellant Dwayne A. Shorter for extension of time to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant Short is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before March 28, 2011. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the motion of appellant Shorter is granted and the brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before January 27, 2011. (Castillo) | |
01/21/2011 | | APPELLANT'S BRIEF (D. Shorter) | |
01/21/2011 | | APPENDIX - Attached to Brief (D. Shorter) | |
03/28/2011 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (L. Short) (no oppo)dwm | |
04/06/2011 | | On consideration of appellant Leonard Short's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that appellant Leonard Short's motion is granted and appellant Leonard Short's brief and limited appendix shall be filed on or before June 27, 2011. Any further requests for extensions oftime will be looked upon with disfavor and grantedonly upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) | |
06/27/2011 | | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (short) no oppo 90 days | |
07/06/2011 | | On consideration of appellant Leonard Delonte Short's motion for an extension of time w/in which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion of appellant Short is granted and the brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 26, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (ETW) | |
09/23/2011 | Filed | Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - for 30 days (Appellant) | |
10/05/2011 | Filed | GRANT - Order Granting appellant Short's motion for extension to file brief and limited appendix to 10/26/11. | |
10/07/2011 | Filed | Motion To Dismiss Appeal - w/waiver attached (Appellant) | Granted |
10/17/2011 | Filed | Order Granting appellant Leonard Short's motion to dismiss appeal no. 10-cf-609 and these appeals are hereby severed, brief of appellee due w/in 30 days. | |
11/16/2011 | Filed | Briefing Completed | |
11/18/2011 | Filed | Brief (Appellee) | |
01/23/2012 | Filed | ACTION - Ready for Calendaring | |
02/08/2012 | Filed | Letter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring | |
02/28/2012 | Filed | Letter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Shorter) (Appellant) | |
03/01/2012 | Filed | ACTION - Calendar notice sent | |
04/04/2012 | Filed | Argued before Judges Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, King
Marc L. Resnick, Esq. for appellant
Dineen A. Baker, Esq. for appellee | |
04/09/2012 | Filed | Motion To Submit Without Oral Argument (Weaver) (Appellant) | Granted |
04/25/2012 | Filed | Order Granting aplt Weaver's motion to submit on briefs. | |
04/26/2012 | Filed | Vacated In Part/Affirmed In Part/Remanded In Part (MOJ)
(Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and King, Senior Judge.) | |
05/18/2012 | Filed | Mandate | |