judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CRUTCHER (BYRON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 32140
Short Caption:CRUTCHER (BYRON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38451 , 41708 , 42355 , 43791 , 44569 , 46767 , 49165 , 49347 , 51930 , 54062 , 55187 , 55266 , 57252 , 57658
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 96C136562Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/14/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
04/13/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived. Criminal.
04/13/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
04/29/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Re: Records on Appeal. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings, in each of the above-identified appeals. 1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 32139, 32140, 32141, 32182, 32190, 32219, 32220, 32227.
09/14/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 and 2 (copies).
09/14/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
02/22/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Proper Person Supplement to Appellant's Oirginal Habeas Corpus (Received the original and 1 copy).
09/26/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. " . . . we reverse the district court order and remand this case to the district court." The district court shall appoint counsel to represent appellant and shall permit appellant to file a petition for a writ of habeas corpus raising issues appropriate for direct appeal. fn1[Under the unique facts of this case, we decline to address appellant's remaining claims at this time.] fn2[The district court shall appoint new and different counsel to represent appellant in these proceedings.] fn3[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter. We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-16935
02/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Denying Request for Clarification. On October 16, 2000, this court received appellant's proper person request for clarification of order. On January 31, 2001, this court received appellant's request to set proceedings in motion. Having reviewed the documents, " . . . we deny the relief requested." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 01-03463
03/13/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-03695
03/13/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/13/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 28, 2001. 01-03695