judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-2793
A-2793
07/07/1950
Application for Writ of Error
J. A. VESTAL, ET AL.
GULF OIL CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/15/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
07/07/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/01/1959Miscellaneous letter
01/10/1951Opinion issued
11/01/1950Submission reset
10/25/1950Document received (See Remarks)
10/25/1950Document received (See Remarks)
07/15/1950Response to Petition
07/07/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/07/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gulf Oil Corporation Respondent
J. A. Vestal, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information